Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/3/2024 5:51:56 PM
Sunday, March 3, 2024
Sunday, March 3, 2024
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: March 3, 2024 12:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 5, 2024 5:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 3, 2024 12:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 6, 2024 5:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 3, 2024 12:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 7, 2024 5:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

House
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: March 3, 2024 2:56 PM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
March 4, 2024 7:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page