2023 Regular Session - Prior Authorization Web Report |
7/25/2023 |
2023 Fiscal Briefing |
1/25/2023 |
2023 – House Capital Budget Subcommittee – Additional Pages – Subcommittee Report |
3/29/2023 |
2023 – Capital Fiscal Briefing |
2/14/2023 |
2023 - Supplemental Budget No. 2 - Fiscal Year 2024 |
3/27/2023 |
2023 - Supplemental Budget No. 1 - Fiscal Year 2024 |
3/3/2023 |
2023 - Senate Capital Budget Subcommittee - Additional Pages - Decision Document |
3/15/2023 |
2023 - Senate Capital Budget Subcommittee - Additional Pages - Decision Document |
4/4/2023 |
2023 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee Reprint of HB201 - (Capital Budget) |
4/7/2023 |
2023 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee Reprint of HB200 - (Budget Bill FY2024) |
3/20/2023 |
2023 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee – Report on HB 200 and 202 – The Budget Bill and the Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act |
3/20/2023 |
2023 - Senate Budget and Taxation – Additional Pages – Subcommittee Report |
3/17/2023 |
2023 - Report of the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to HB201 (Capital Budget) |
4/7/2023 |
2023 - Report of the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to HB200 (Budget Bill FY2024) |
3/20/2023 |
2023 - Report of the Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee |
3/17/2023 |
2023 - Report of the House Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Report of the House Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Report of the House Health and Social Services Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Report of the House Education and Economic Development Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Report of the House Capital Budget Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Report of the House Appropriations Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to HB201 (Capital Budget Bill) |
3/31/2023 |
2023 - Report of the House Appropriations Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to HB200 (Budget Bill FY2024) |
3/14/2023 |
2023 - Report of the Health and Human Services Subcommittee to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee |
3/17/2023 |
2023 - Report of the Education, Business, and Administration Subcommittee to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee |
3/17/2023 |
2023 - Report of the Capital Budget Subcommittee to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee |
3/17/2023 |
2023 - Report of the Capital Budget Subcommittee to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee |
4/5/2023 |
2023 - Report of the Capital Budget Subcommittee to the House Appropriations Committee |
3/29/2023 |
2023 - Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Additional Pages - Decision Document |
3/15/2023 |
2023 - Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment – Additional Pages - Subcommittee Report |
3/17/2023 |
2023 - Miscellaneous Capital Projects |
4/13/2023 |
2023 - Joint Chairmen's Report - Report on the Fiscal 2024 - State Operating Budget (HB200) and the State Capital Budget (HB201) and Related Recommendations |
4/18/2023 |
2023 - House Capital Budget Subcommittee - Additional Pages - Decision Document |
3/29/2023 |
2023 - House Appropriations Committee Reprint of HB201 (Capital Budget) |
3/30/2023 |
2023 - House Appropriations Committee Reprint of HB200 - (Budget Bill FY2024) |
3/14/2023 |
2023 - House Appropriations Committee – Report on HB 200 and 202 – The Budget Bill and the Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act |
3/14/2023 |
2023 - Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Additional Pages - Decision Document |
3/15/2023 |
2023 - Health and Human Services – Additional Pages – Subcommittee Report |
3/17/2023 |
2023 - Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Additional Pages - Decision Document |
3/15/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document Health and Social Services Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document Education and Economic Development Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document Capital Budget Subcommittee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document – Senate Budget and Taxation – Full Committee |
3/17/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document – Public Safety, Transportation, and the Environment Subcommittee |
3/15/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document – Health and Human Services Subcommittee |
3/15/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document – Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee |
3/15/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document - Senate Capital Budget Subcommittee |
3/15/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document - Senate Capital Budget Subcommittee |
4/4/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document - House Capital Budget Subcommittee |
3/29/2023 |
2023 - Decision Document - House Appropriations Full Committee |
3/10/2023 |
2023 - Conference Committee Summary Report on HB200 and HB202 |
4/3/2022 |
2023 - Conference Committee Report on House Bill 200 - the Budget Bill |
4/3/2023 |
2023 - Analysis of Supplemental Budget No. 1 - Fiscal Year 2024 |
3/7/2023 |