Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/20/2023 3:09:27 PM
Monday, March 20, 2023
Monday, March 20, 2023
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 2:37 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 20, 2023 3:10 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 2:16 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
March 20, 2023 2:45 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 20, 2023 3:00 PM)
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 20, 2023 10:20 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 23, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
HB0299
Del Lehman, et al

Environment - Synthetic Turf - Chain of Custody
ADDED: 10:20 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 11:52 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 21, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0565
Sens Ready and Klausmeier

Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Audits of Pharmacies and Pharmacists
REMOVED: 11:52 AM
SB0895
Sens Ready and Klausmeier

Pharmacy Benefits Administration - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Pharmacy Benefits Managers
REMOVED: 11:52 AM
SB0896
Sens Ready and Klausmeier

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
REMOVED: 11:52 AM
SB0898
Sens Ready and Klausmeier

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser
REMOVED: 11:52 AM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 2:18 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
March 20, 2023 2:45 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 10:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
March 20, 2023 12:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 10:32 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 20, 2023 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0830
Del Terrasa, et al

Residential Construction or Significant Renovation - Electric Vehicle Charging
ADDED: 9:59 AM
HB0934
Del Hutchinson, et al

Natural Resources - Female Deer Hunting Contests - Authorization
ADDED: 9:59 AM
HB1087
Wicomico County Delegation

Wicomico County - Sunday Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones
ADDED: 9:59 AM
HB0423
Del Holmes

Task Force on Common Ownership Communities
ADDED: 10:32 AM

Change made: March 20, 2023 2:47 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 28, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
SB0382
Sen M. Washington

Accessory Dwelling Unit Policy Task Force
SB0535
Sen James, et al

Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Service Dogs
SB0651
Sen Carter

Real Estate - Real Estate Brokerage Services and Termination of Residential Real Estate Contracts (The Anthony Moorman Act)

Change made: March 20, 2023 2:49 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 29, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
SB0010
Sens Bailey and Hester

Department of Natural Resources – Documents – Digital or Electronic Issuance
SB0434
Sen Klausmeier

Natural Resources - Restorative Aquaculture Pilot Program
SB0471
Sen Elfreth

Sediment Control Plans, Discharge Permits for Stormwater Associated With Construction Activity, and Notice and Comment Requirements

Environment Subcommittee
Change made: March 20, 2023 2:22 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
March 20, 2023 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 2:30 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 22, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
SB0286
Sen Simonaire, et al

Department of Veterans Affairs - Burial in State Veterans' Cemeteries - Spouses and Dependents
ADDED: 2:30 PM
SB0478
Sen Sydnor, et al

Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
ADDED: 2:30 PM
SB0514
Sen Lam, et al

Local Procurements - Minority Business Enterprise Utilization Programs - Certification
ADDED: 2:30 PM
SB0842
Sen Kramer, et al

Maryland Holocaust Remembrance Day
ADDED: 2:30 PM
SB0910
Sen Simonaire

Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program – Definitions – Therapy Horse
ADDED: 2:30 PM

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: March 20, 2023 2:44 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 23, 2023 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0011
Sen Sydnor

Motor Vehicles - Establishment of School Zones
ADDED: 2:44 PM
SB0249
Sen Kramer

Motor Vehicle Administration - Driver Education Program - Cannabis or Alcohol
ADDED: 2:44 PM
SB0303
Sen Mautz

Talbot County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue
ADDED: 2:44 PM
SB0545
Sens Muse and Jackson

Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Reclamation Hours
ADDED: 2:44 PM
SB0705
Chr JPR (Dept)

Vehicle Laws – Certificate of Title – Surviving Spouse
ADDED: 2:44 PM
SB0709
Chr JPR (Dept)

Motor Vehicles - Commercial Driver's Licenses and Instructional Permits - Revisions
ADDED: 2:44 PM
SB0718
Chr, Educ, Energy, and Env Committee

Voluntary Cleanup Program - Determination and Recordation Deadlines
ADDED: 2:44 PM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 1:54 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
SB0469
Sens Elfreth and Guzzone

Task Force to Study Solar Tax Incentives
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0442
Sen Corderman

Economic Development – Sports Entertainment Facilities – Financing and Construction
ADDED: 1:54 PM
SB0537
Sen King

Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
ADDED: 1:54 PM
SB0624
Sen Zucker, et al

Income Tax - Automated External Defibrillator Tax Credit
ADDED: 1:54 PM
SB0640
Sen Jackson, et al

Sales and Use Tax - Electricity for Agricultural Purposes - Exemption
ADDED: 1:54 PM
SB0692
Sens King and Hester

Income Tax - Credit for Purchase of Zero-Emission and Hybrid Mobile Machinery
ADDED: 1:54 PM

Other
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
Change made: March 20, 2023 2:54 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - Other
March 22, 2023 9:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 142, Annapolis, MD
Review of Disclosures and Disclaimers
Work Session

Click to return on the top page