Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/23/2024 9:52:20 PM
Friday, February 23, 2024
Friday, February 23, 2024
Senate
Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: February 23, 2024 1:40 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
February 27, 2024 10:30 AM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: February 23, 2024 4:37 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 26, 2024 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Department of Disabilities
REMOVED: 4:37 PM
Military Department
REMOVED: 4:37 PM
Maryland Environmental Service
REMOVED: 4:37 PM
Department of State Police
REMOVED: 4:37 PM

Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: February 23, 2024 12:20 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD)
HB0128
Dels Rosenberg and Kipke

Crimes - Interfering With a Legislative Proceeding
HB0321
Del Attar

Criminal Law - Crimes of Arson - Prohibitions and Penalties
HB0496
Del Shetty, et al

Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 23, 2024 3:26 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1099
Del Guyton

Veterinary Practitioners and Veterinary Technicians - Compounding Prescription Drugs - Authorization and Requirements
REMOVED: 3:26 PM

Change made: February 23, 2024 4:32 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 7, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1369
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) MC 11-24
ADDED: 4:32 PM

Change made: February 23, 2024 11:36 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 8, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0343
Del Munoz

Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Membership
ADDED: 11:36 AM
HB0812
Del J. Long, et al

Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland – Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission – Funding
ADDED: 11:36 AM

Family Law Subcommittee
Change made: February 23, 2024 12:13 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Family Law Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
February 26, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD)
HB0406
Del Simpson, et al

Marriage – Confidential Communication – Criminal Charge
HB0542
Del Vogel, et al

Department of Human Services - Children in Foster Care - Luggage
HB0690
Charles County Delegation

Charles County - Adult Protective Services Review Board - Membership

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 23, 2024 5:31 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2024 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1094
Del Lopez

Public Health - Overdose Prevention Site Pilot Program
REMOVED: 5:31 PM

Public Safety Subcommittee
Change made: February 23, 2024 1:48 PM - HEARING ADDED
Public Safety Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
February 26, 2024 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0575
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
HB0585
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 23, 2024 12:47 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 26, 2024 11:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB1370
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County Public Schools - School Personnel Training - Religious Discrimination Prevention MC 22-24
REMOVED: 12:47 PM

Change made: February 23, 2024 5:09 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB1287
The Spkr, et al

State and County Superintendents of Schools - Employment Contracts - School Leadership Course or Program
REMOVED: 5:09 PM

Change made: February 23, 2024 5:10 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB1287
The Spkr, et al

State and County Superintendents of Schools - Employment Contracts - School Leadership Course or Program
ADDED: 5:10 PM

Other
Maryland Insurance Administration
Change made: February 23, 2024 11:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Insurance Administration - Other
March 27, 2024 1:00 PM to March 27, 2024 4:00 PM
24th Floor Hearing Room, Maryland Insurance Administration, 200 St. Paul Pl., Baltimore
The purpose of the hearing is for insurance company officials to explain the reasons for the rate increases and for the Administration to consider whether the proposed increases comply with Maryland's laws and regulations.
The hearing will focus on several rate increase requests from Bankers Life and Casualty Company, Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, and Transamerica Life Insurance Company. In the group long-term care market these include requests from Transamerica Life Insurance Company.

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Change made: February 23, 2024 12:23 PM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
February 26, 2024 3:30 PM
Miller Senate Building, Welcome Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page