Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/24/2022 3:37:38 PM
Monday, January 24, 2022
Monday, January 24, 2022
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 24, 2022 11:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
January 26, 2022 1:30 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0040
Sens Hester and Guzzone

Interagency Commission on School Construction – Systemic Renovation Projects – Eligibility
SB0109
Sen Elfreth

Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
SB0114
Sen Waldstreicher

False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller
SB0179
Chr B&T (Dept)

Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
SB0181
Chr B&T (Dept)

Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
SB0183
Chr B&T (Dept)

State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
SB0187
Chr B&T (Dept)

Department of Transportation – Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds
SB0194
Chr B&T (Dept)

Property Tax - Deadline Extension for Homeowners to Redeem Property Involved in a Tax Sale
SB0197
Chr B&T (Dept)

Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Retroactive Qualification and Calculation of the Credit
SB0201
Chr B&T (Dept)

State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Property Appraisal Aids and Record Retention (Microfilm to Digital Act of 2022)
SB0210
Chr B&T (Dept)

Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion
SB0215
Chr B&T (Dept)

Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations and Extension

Change made: January 24, 2022 1:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0271
Sen Guzzone

Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties
SB0274
Sen Hayes, et al

Property Tax - Exemptions for Business Personal Property - Alterations
SB0289
Sens McCray and Hester

Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Funding and Extension
ADDED: 1:31 PM
SB0297
Sens Young and Hough

Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
ADDED: 1:31 PM

Change made: January 24, 2022 12:32 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0085
Sen Jackson

Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
SB0132
Sen Bailey

Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer
SB0148
Sens Patterson and Young

Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans
SB0228
Sen Ferguson

Maryland Corps Program – Revisions

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 24, 2022 3:35 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0341
Caroline County Senators

Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries
ADDED: 3:35 PM

Change made: January 24, 2022 3:35 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0324
Sen Lee

Intercepted Communications - Penalty
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0326
Sen Lee

Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Minor Victim
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0328
Sen Waldstreicher, et al

Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0331
Sen King

Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims – Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0338
Sen Hough, et al

Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0375
Sen Lee

Crimes - Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications - Exception for Imminent Danger
ADDED: 3:35 PM

Change made: January 24, 2022 3:35 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0313
Sens Watson and Carter

Civil Actions - Damages - Use of Race, Ethnicity, and Gender Data
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0315
Sen Hettleman, et al

Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0317
Sens West and Waldstreicher

State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0336
Sen Carozza, et al

Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0347
Sen Beidle, et al

Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0357
Sen Benson, et al

Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0371
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0377
Sen Lee

Marriage Records - Name Change
ADDED: 3:35 PM

Change made: January 24, 2022 3:35 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0277
Sen McCray

Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0319
Sen McCray

Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0327
Sen Ready, et al

Public Safety – Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun – Qualifications
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0339
Sen Hough, et al

Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
ADDED: 3:35 PM
SB0356
Sens West and Ready

Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement
ADDED: 3:35 PM

House
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: January 24, 2022 10:19 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
January 26, 2022 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HBs 13, 163, 167

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: January 24, 2022 10:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
January 27, 2022 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 24, 2022 2:34 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
February 1, 2022 12:30 PM to February 1, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Local Government Finances

Other
Montgomery
Change made: January 24, 2022 3:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 28, 2022 8:30 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of Legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

Click to return on the top page