Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/25/2021 8:13:50 PM
Monday, October 25, 2021
Monday, October 25, 2021
Other
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Change made: October 25, 2021 10:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the - Other
November 3, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Public testimony related to the School Facilities Assessment may be submitted to Michele Lambert (Michele.Lambert@mlis.state.md.us)

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: October 25, 2021 8:25 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
November 1, 2021 4:30 PM
First Baptist Church of Glenarden, Ministry Center, 3600 Brightseat Road, Landover, MD 20785
Informational Meeting to the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Change made: October 25, 2021 8:40 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
November 4, 2021 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the November 1 meeting at First Baptist Church of Glenarden.
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Change made: October 25, 2021 8:31 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
November 4, 2021 4:30 PM
Governor's Hall at Sailwinds West, 200 Byrn Street, Cambridge, MD 21613
Informational Meeting to the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Change made: October 25, 2021 8:47 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
November 9, 2021 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the November 4 meeting at Governor's Hall at Sailwinds.
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Change made: October 25, 2021 3:11 PM - HEARING ADDED
Sports Wagering Application Review Commission - Other
November 3, 2021 10:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page