Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/22/2024 10:46:15 AM
Thursday, February 22, 2024
Thursday, February 22, 2024
House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 22, 2024 10:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
February 23, 2024 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 22, 2024 10:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1388
Del Hill

Labor and Employment – Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses – Veterinary and Health Care Professionals
ADDED: 10:08 AM

Change made: February 22, 2024 10:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 8, 2024 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1388
Del Hill

Labor and Employment – Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses – Veterinary and Health Care Professionals
REMOVED: 10:08 AM

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 9:11 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
February 22, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB146, HB152, HB628, and HB755
REMOVED: 9:11 AM
HB146, HB152, HB628, and HB755
ADDED: 9:11 AM
HB380
ADDED: 9:11 AM

Local Revenues Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 9:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Local Revenues Subcommittee - Work Session
February 27, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page