Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/31/2023 9:02:43 PM
Friday, March 31, 2023
Friday, March 31, 2023
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: March 31, 2023 4:08 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
April 3, 2023 2:30 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: March 31, 2023 1:22 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
March 31, 2023 2:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0260
Sen West, et al

Maryland Paint Stewardship

Change made: March 31, 2023 8:23 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
April 3, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Finance Committee
Change made: March 31, 2023 1:54 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 31, 2023 2:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 31, 2023 1:00 PM)
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: March 31, 2023 12:46 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
March 31, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: March 31, 2023 3:12 PM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Work Session
April 3, 2023 10:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- SB 340
REMOVED: 3:12 PM
- SB 21

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: March 31, 2023 11:12 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
March 31, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0284
Del Love, et al

Environment – Reducing Packaging Materials – Producer Responsibility
ADDED: 11:12 AM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: March 31, 2023 10:56 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 31, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 31, 2023 2:30 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: March 31, 2023 3:30 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: March 31, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Environment Subcommittee
Change made: March 31, 2023 10:56 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
March 31, 2023 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 31, 2023 12:30 PM)
Zoom / YouTube

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 31, 2023 10:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
April 3, 2023 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB 627, SB 331, and SB 773.

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: March 31, 2023 4:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
April 3, 2023 6:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: March 31, 2023 11:09 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
April 3, 2023 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB 786 and SBs 145, 648, 726, 728, 731, and 871.
SB 727.
ADDED: 11:09 AM

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: March 31, 2023 3:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
April 3, 2023 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: March 31, 2023 3:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
April 5, 2023 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee
Change made: March 31, 2023 10:52 AM - HEARING ADDED
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Work Session
April 4, 2023 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SBs 724 and 725.

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 31, 2023 4:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
April 3, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: March 31, 2023 4:12 PM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
April 4, 2023 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: March 31, 2023 10:56 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
March 31, 2023 2:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 31, 2023 2:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: March 31, 2023 4:13 PM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
April 4, 2023 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Other
Conference Committee
Change made: March 31, 2023 11:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Conference Committee - Other
March 31, 2023 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Change made: March 31, 2023 4:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
April 3, 2023 2:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Vote on House bills

Click to return on the top page