Update Report
As of: 3/26/2023 6:06:50 PM
Change made: March 26, 2023 6:03 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 28, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
SB0167
Sen Elfreth, et al
Maryland State Arts Council - Funding
SB0239
Sen Feldman
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Domestic Partnerships
SB0276
Sen McKay
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Frostburg City Police Department
SB0426
Sen King, et al
University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Quasi-Endowment Funds
SB0467
Calvert County Senators
Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Calvert County Public Schools
SB0501
Sen M. Washington
Libraries - Aging Infrastructure Improvement Grant Program - Established
SB0527
Sens Waldstreicher and Smith
Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs
SB0561
Sen Guzzone
Goodwill Industries of Chesapeake Excel Center in Baltimore City - Alterations
SB0562
Sen Guzzone, et al
Maryland Small Food Banks Grant Program - Establishment
SB0641
Sen Jackson
Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System – City of Bowie Police Department – Transfers and Purchases of Service
SB0707
Chr JPR (Dept)
Public Safety - Deputy State Fire Marshal - Probationary Status and Promotion
SB0722
Chr B&T (Dept)
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Mandatory Retirement Age – Repeal
SB0833
Prince George's County Senators
Prince George’s County Violence Interrupter Support Program Fund
Change made: March 26, 2023 5:37 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 29, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
SB0024
Sen McCray, et al
Department of Transportation - Financing and Commission on Transportation Revenue and Infrastructure Needs (State and Federal Transportation Funding Act)
ADDED: 5:31 PM
HB1252
Dels Schmidt and Holmes
Public Safety - Volunteer Company Assistance Fund - Alterations
ADDED: 5:37 PM
HB1286
Del McCaskill
Human Services - Benefits Cliff Pilot Program - Establishment
ADDED: 5:37 PM
SB0002
Sen Hester
Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Theft of Benefits (Prevent Electronic Benefits Theft Act of 2023)
ADDED: 5:37 PM
SB0082
Sen Mautz
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Talbot County
ADDED: 5:37 PM
SB0580
Sen Elfreth, et al
Public Safety - Officer and Community Wellness Training Grant Fund
ADDED: 5:37 PM
SB0659
The Pres (Office of the Comptroller)
Modernization of State Financial Systems - 21st Century Financial Systems Enterprise
ADDED: 5:37 PM
Change made: March 26, 2023 5:37 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
SB0617
Sen Hettleman, et al
Maryland Transit Administration – Fare Price Requirements – Alterations
ADDED: 5:37 PM
SB0660
The Pres (Office of the Cmptrller), et al
Office of the Comptroller – Taxpayer Advocate Division
ADDED: 5:37 PM
SB0922
Sen Rosapepe, et al
Maryland Construction Education and Innovation Fund - Funding - Alteration
ADDED: 5:37 PM
Change made: March 26, 2023 5:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
April 4, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
SB0006
Sen McCray
Maryland Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans - Automatic Enrollment - Study
SB0162
Sen Lam, et al
Maryland Aviation Commission - Duties, Composition, and Member Orientation
SB0360
Sen Guzzone
Public School Construction - Grant Programs, Approvals, and Administration - Alterations
SB0643
Sen McCray, et al
Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding
SB0650
Sen Elfreth, et al
Public Safety - State Disaster Recovery Fund
SB0756
Sen Guzzone, et al
Access to Counsel in Evictions - Funding
SB0818
Sen A. Washington
Education - Public High School Athletic and Physical Education Facilities - Study
SB0834
Sen Jackson (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative Fees