Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/29/2024 8:07:46 PM
Thursday, February 29, 2024
Thursday, February 29, 2024
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 11:58 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0731
Sen Carter

State Facilities – Procedures for Changes and Closures – Definition and Reporting
REMOVED: 11:58 AM

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 9:36 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2024 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
SB1007
Sen Hayes

State Government - Executive Appointments

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 5:10 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2024 12:55 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 29, 2024 3:47 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB1169
Del Hinebaugh

Education - Minimum School Funding - Waiver
REMOVED: 3:47 PM

Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: February 29, 2024 9:26 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0059
Del Mangione

Crimes of Violence - Motor Vehicle Theft
REMOVED: 9:26 AM
HB0359
Del J. Long, et al

Petition for Guardianship of the Property of Alleged Disabled Person - Stay of Civil Actions and Proceedings
ADDED: 9:26 AM

Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: February 29, 2024 5:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0128
Dels Rosenberg and Kipke

Crimes - Interfering With a Legislative Proceeding
HB0321
Del Attar

Criminal Law - Crimes of Arson - Prohibitions and Penalties
HB0496
Del Shetty, et al

Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 8:07 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0084
Del Kerr

Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0149
Dels Pippy and Kerr

Medical Records - Destruction - Authorization
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0328
Del Lopez, et al

Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies - Revisions
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0367
Del Smith, et al

Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0394
Del Guzzone, et al

Human Relations - Commission on Civil Rights - Appeal of Final Orders
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0581
The Spkr (Admin), et al

State Government - Permits, Licenses, and Certificates - Processing (Transparent Government Act of 2024)
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0673
Del Embry, et al

Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0757
Del R. Lewis

State Board of Physicians - Supervised Medical Graduates and Cardiovascular Invasive Specialists (Bridge to Medical Residency Act)
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0759
Del Alston

Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification Requirements
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0786
Del Bagnall

Health Occupations – Limited License to Practice Dentistry – Services for Adults
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0809
Del Vogel

Members of Boards, Committees, Commissions, Task Forces, or Workgroups – Removal or Suspension
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0827
Del Qi

Maryland Insurance Administration – Professional Employer Organizations – Study
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0874
Del Pena-Melnyk, et al

State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0887
Del Pena-Melnyk, et al

Maryland Department of Health - Health Commissions and Maryland Insurance Administration - Study
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0938
Del Crosby, et al

State–Owned Nursing Homes – Deficiencies, Citations, and Fines – Reporting Requirements
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB0953
Del Pena-Melnyk, et al

Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - State-Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program - Amount of Annual Subsidies
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB1002
Chr HGO (Atty Gen Ofc), et al

Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Attorney General - Investigative Authority
ADDED: 8:07 PM
HB1103
Del Wolek, et al

Miriam Kelty Aging and Senior Social Connection Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
ADDED: 8:07 PM

Change made: February 29, 2024 12:21 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2024 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1359
Del Rosenberg, et al

Facilities - Disabilities and Juveniles - Community Relations Plans
REMOVED: 12:21 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 11:03 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB1298
Del Young

Family Law - Paternity - Surname (Maryland Paternal Naming Rights Act)
REMOVED: 11:03 AM

Change made: February 29, 2024 5:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2024 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0125
Del Rogers

Courts – Military Records – Recordation and Inspection
HB0141
Dels Pippy and Simpson

Criminal Procedure - Child Abuse Victim - Testimony Taken Outside the Courtroom
HB0172
Chr JUD (Dept)

Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process
HB0249
Chr JUD (Dept)

Public Safety - Statewide DNA Database System, DNA Collection, and Penalties - Alterations
HB0259
Del Chang

District Court - Traffic Cases - Surcharges
HB0274
Del Simpson, et al

Intercepted Communications - Penalty
HB0290
Dels Grammer and Bartlett

Crimes - Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications - Exception for Imminent Danger
HB0315
Del Bartlett

Regulated Firearms - Department of State Police - Reporting Requirements
HB0324
Del Cardin

Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
HB0476
Del Bartlett, et al

Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis and Search – Applicability for Deceased and Missing Children
HB0498
Del Cardin

Real Property - Access to Counsel in Evictions Program - Mandated Reports
HB0549
Del Embry, et al

Statute of Limitations - Prosecution or Enforcement of Local Consumer Protection Codes
HB0664
Del Clippinger, et al

Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
HB1127
Del Bartlett

Sexual Assault Forensic Examinations Conducted Through Telehealth - Reimbursement and Study

Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 9:22 AM - HEARING ADDED
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1202
Del Fisher, et al

Amendments Convention Called Under Article V of the U.S. Constitution - Delegation to the Convention
HJ0002
Del Acevero, et al

Supporting a Long-Term Ceasefire in Israel and Palestine
HJ0003
Del Williams, et al

Use of Nuclear Weapons
HJ0006
Del Jacobs, et al

Commercial Fishery Disaster Declaration Due to Invasive Species
HJ0008
Del Martinez, et al

Condemning Islamophobia, Anti-Palestinian Hate, and Antisemitism

Other
State Debt, Commission on
Change made: February 29, 2024 3:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
State Debt, Commission on - Other
April 11, 2024 10:00 AM
Assembly Room #114-116, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Annual meeting to recommend a State tax rate on real and personal property.

Click to return on the top page