Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/3/2023 10:10:50 AM
Friday, February 3, 2023
Friday, February 3, 2023
House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 3, 2023 9:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0202
The Spkr (Admin)

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2023

Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Change made: February 3, 2023 9:29 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 6, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 6, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
University System of Maryland Overview

Change made: February 3, 2023 9:38 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 13, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 13, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
MSDE Early Childhood Development

Change made: February 3, 2023 9:41 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 20, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 20, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Accountability and Implementation Board
University of Maryland, College Park Campus
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance

Change made: February 3, 2023 9:41 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 27, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 27, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Maryland State Library Agency
University of Maryland Eastern Shore
Maryland Higher Education Commission
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 3, 2023 8:55 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0286
Del Shetty

Perfusionists – Licensure Exemption – Employees and Agents of Federally Designated Organ Procurement Organizations
REMOVED: 8:55 AM

Other
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board
Change made: February 3, 2023 8:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board - Other
February 6, 2023 9:00 AM to February 6, 2023 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
General Meeting

Click to return on the top page