Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/28/2024 3:12:42 PM
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 9:31 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0903
Sen Muse

Prince George’s County – Mobile Sports Wagering Proceeds – Local Impact Grant
REMOVED: 9:31 AM

Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 3:00 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2024 9:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0129
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Election Costs and Administration
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB0493
Sen Kagan

Elections – Ranked–Choice Voting – Contests for Presidential Nomination in 2028
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB0695
Sen Feldman

Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB0918
Sen Brooks

Retail Choice Customer Education and Protection Fund - Purposes and Uses
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB0935
Sen Gallion

Department of General Services - Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program - Establishment
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB1084
Sen M. Washington

State Government - Commission for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB1023
Sen Brooks, et al

Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
REMOVED: 3:00 PM

Change made: February 28, 2024 3:01 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0129
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Election Costs and Administration
SB0493
Sen Kagan

Elections – Ranked–Choice Voting – Contests for Presidential Nomination in 2028
SB0695
Sen Feldman

Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
SB0918
Sen Brooks

Retail Choice Customer Education and Protection Fund - Purposes and Uses
SB0935
Sen Gallion

Department of General Services - Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program - Establishment
SB1084
Sen M. Washington

State Government - Commission for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing
SB1023
Sen Brooks, et al

Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
ADDED: 3:01 PM

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 12:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
March 4, 2024 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: February 28, 2024 12:01 PM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
March 4, 2024 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 12:32 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
February 28, 2024 4:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 28, 2024 12:45 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: February 28, 2024 12:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Governor's Office of Children

Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: February 28, 2024 1:43 PM - HEARING ADDED
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0059
Del Mangione

Crimes of Violence - Motor Vehicle Theft
HB0392
Dels Stewart and Young

Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
HB0528
Del Buckel

Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law
HB0698
Dels Bartlett and Pena-Melnyk

Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Person of a Disabled Person - Expedited Proceedings

Election Law Subcommittee
Change made: February 28, 2024 2:21 PM - HEARING ADDED
Election Law Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 12:15 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 3:09 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1423
Dels S. Johnson and A. Johnson

Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Step Therapy, Fail-First Protocols, and Prior Authorization - Prescription Drugs to Treat Serious Mental Illness
REMOVED: 12:27 PM
HB1132
Del M. Morgan, et al

Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Off-Label Use - Promotion
REMOVED: 3:09 PM

Oversight Committee on Personnel
Change made: February 28, 2024 12:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
Oversight Committee on Personnel - Voting Session
February 29, 2024 9:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Other
Maryland Economic Development Commission
Change made: February 28, 2024 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Economic Development Commission - Other
March 20, 2024 3:00 PM
Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce; Preliminary discussion on the development of a Strategic Plan.

Montgomery
Change made: February 28, 2024 10:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
March 1, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation.

Change made: February 28, 2024 10:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
March 1, 2024 9:30 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.

Click to return on the top page