Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/28/2023 11:41:55 AM
Saturday, January 28, 2023
Saturday, January 28, 2023
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 28, 2023 10:40 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0247
Sen Kramer, et al

State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Faculty, Part–Time Faculty, and Graduate Assistants
SB0258
Sen Lam

Hospital Credentialing - Reappointment Process for Physician Staff - Modification
SB0259
Sen Lam

Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
SB0284
Sen Carter (BCA)

Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining
SB0298
Sens Kramer and Ellis

State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Supervisory and Managerial Employees
SB0299
Sen Kramer, et al

Food Service Facilities - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Joe Sheya Act)
SB0337
Sen Gile, et al

Utility Contractors - Employment and Licensure - Requirements and Application

Other
Howard
Change made: January 28, 2023 7:23 AM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
February 1, 2023 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation and Howard County Senators work session on local legislation

Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland
Change made: January 28, 2023 7:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland - Other
February 2, 2023 8:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland Meeting

Change made: January 28, 2023 7:35 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland - Other
February 9, 2023 8:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland Meeting

Change made: January 28, 2023 7:36 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland - Other
February 16, 2023 8:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland Meeting

Change made: January 28, 2023 7:37 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland - Other
February 23, 2023 8:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland Meeting

Prince George's
Change made: January 28, 2023 7:41 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Prince George's - Other
February 2, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
REMOVED: 7:41 AM
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
REMOVED: 7:41 AM
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation.
REMOVED: 7:41 AM
The Bi-County Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
REMOVED: 7:41 AM
Public Safety
ADDED: 7:41 AM
Criminal Procedure
ADDED: 7:41 AM
Police
ADDED: 7:41 AM
The Law Enforcement Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
ADDED: 7:41 AM
Gaming
ADDED: 7:41 AM
Alcoholic Beverages
ADDED: 7:41 AM
Courts
ADDED: 7:41 AM

Change made: January 28, 2023 7:45 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Prince George's - Other
February 9, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
REMOVED: 7:45 AM
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommendation to the full delegation.
REMOVED: 7:45 AM
The Bi-County Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
REMOVED: 7:45 AM
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
REMOVED: 7:45 AM
Courts
ADDED: 7:45 AM
The Law Enforcement Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
ADDED: 7:45 AM
Police
ADDED: 7:45 AM
Alcoholic Beverages
ADDED: 7:45 AM
Criminal Procedure
ADDED: 7:45 AM
Public Safety
ADDED: 7:45 AM
Gaming
ADDED: 7:45 AM

Change made: January 28, 2023 7:48 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Prince George's - Other
February 16, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
REMOVED: 7:48 AM
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommendation to the full delegation.
REMOVED: 7:48 AM
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
REMOVED: 7:48 AM
The Bi-County Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
REMOVED: 7:48 AM
Public Safety
ADDED: 7:48 AM
Courts
ADDED: 7:48 AM
Criminal Procedure
ADDED: 7:48 AM
The Law Enforcement Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
ADDED: 7:48 AM
Alcoholic Beverages
ADDED: 7:48 AM
Police
ADDED: 7:48 AM
Gaming
ADDED: 7:48 AM

Change made: January 28, 2023 7:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Prince George's - Overview
February 23, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
The Bi-County Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
REMOVED: 7:51 AM
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommendation to the full delegation.
REMOVED: 7:51 AM
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
REMOVED: 7:51 AM
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
REMOVED: 7:51 AM
Gaming
ADDED: 7:51 AM
Police
ADDED: 7:51 AM
Alcoholic Beverages
ADDED: 7:51 AM
Courts
ADDED: 7:51 AM
The Law Enforcement Committee covers the following and related issue area:
ADDED: 7:51 AM
Criminal Procedure
ADDED: 7:51 AM
Public Safety
ADDED: 7:51 AM

Click to return on the top page