Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/26/2024 11:37:54 AM
Monday, February 26, 2024
Monday, February 26, 2024
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 26, 2024 11:01 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Work Session
February 26, 2024 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Information Technology Workforce
REMOVED: 11:01 AM
Information Technology Workgroup
ADDED: 11:01 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: February 26, 2024 11:20 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0696
Sen Feldman

Energy Generation Projects - Labor and Minority Business Enterprise Requirements
REMOVED: 11:20 AM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 26, 2024 10:39 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0263
Del Qi

State Highway Administration - Sidewalks and Bicycle Pathways - Maintenance and Repair
ADDED: 10:39 AM
HB0376
Prince George's County Delegation

Study on the Feasibility of Relocating the Prince George's County Public School System Headquarters PG 501-24
ADDED: 10:39 AM
HB0527
Del Solomon

Legacy Admissions
ADDED: 10:39 AM
HB0815
Del Spiegel, et al

Economic Development - Maryland Financial Empowerment Center Network Pilot Program - Establishment
ADDED: 10:39 AM
HB0842
Del Taveras, et al

Environmental Justice - Investment in Infrastructure Construction Projects
ADDED: 10:39 AM
HB1415
Del Smith

Education - Community Schools - Report
ADDED: 10:39 AM

Change made: February 26, 2024 11:18 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 12, 2024 12:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 12, 2024 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0407
Del Kaufman, et al

Food Supplement Benefits - Students - Eligibility (SNAP for Students)
HB0670
Del Grammer, et al

State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
HB1091
Del Vogel, et al

Public Safety - Reproductive Health Care Clinic Security Grant Program - Establishment (Protecting Reproductive Health Care Clinics Act)
HB1305
Washington County Delegation

State Personnel - Correctional Services - Employee Pay and Benefits
HB1313
Del Anderton

Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership - 9-1-1 Specialists
HB1381
Del Reilly

Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten - Payments to Private Providers and Building Use
HB1389
Del Lehman

Public Safety Officer - Performance of Duties - Death Benefit
HB1402
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – State’s Attorney’s Office Personnel – Application of County Personnel Laws and Collective Bargaining MC 12–24
HB1440
Howard County Delegation

Howard County Public Schools - Differences in Capital Budget Proposals - Report Ho. Co. 16-24
HB1442
Howard County Delegation

Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Howard County Public Schools - Established Ho. Co. 14-24
HB1450
Howard County Delegation

Howard County Task Force to Study Revenue Options for School Capital Needs Ho. Co. 18-24
HB1453
Del Guyton

Foster Care Families Child Care Assistance Program and Fund - Establishment

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2024 9:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
February 28, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB84, HB149, HB328, HB566, HB581, HB598, HB673, HB723, HB809, HB1002

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2024 9:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB499, HB757, HB759, HB806, HB874, HB938, HB1103

Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2024 9:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Work Session
February 27, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB827, HB939, HB953

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 26, 2024 10:21 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
February 26, 2024 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0054
Del Atterbeary

Property Tax - Transfer to Heir - Payment Plans
HB0066
Del Charkoudian

Property Tax Credits - Public School Employees, Health and Safety Improvements, and Property Used for Local Housing Programs
HB0204
Del Attar, et al

Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
HB0208
Chr W&M (Dept)

County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
HB0336
Del Forbes, et al

Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Materials for Individualized Education Program Meetings
HB0452
The Spkr (Office of the Comptroller)

Individual Tax Preparers - Code of Ethics, Notification of Actions, Enforcement, and Penalties (Stop Scam Tax Preparers Act)
HB0454
The Spkr (Office of the Comptroller)

Disclosure of Tax Information - Tax Compliance Activity and Binding Data Use Agreements
HB0615
Del Ruth, et al

Education - Prohibited Behavior on School Grounds and Property - Application
HB0634
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Student Information – United States Census Bureau
HB0646
Del Simmons, et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliary and Reserve Volunteers
HB0753
Del Young

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Application and Reporting Requirements
HB0776
Del Feldmark

Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority

Click to return on the top page