Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/4/2024 2:29:32 PM
Monday, March 4, 2024
Monday, March 4, 2024
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 12:26 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0936
Sen Gallion

Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
REMOVED: 10:26 AM
SB0798
Sen Hester

Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board, Stream Restoration Contractors, and Stream Restoration Project Requirements
REMOVED: 12:26 PM

Change made: March 4, 2024 12:27 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0798
Sen Hester

Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board, Stream Restoration Contractors, and Stream Restoration Project Requirements

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 10:31 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 7, 2024 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB1108
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office
ADDED: 10:31 AM

House
Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 1:31 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee - Work Session
March 8, 2024 3:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 4, 2024 3:30 PM)
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: Zoom / YouTube)

Appropriations Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 11:42 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0527
Del Solomon

Legacy Admissions
REMOVED: 11:42 AM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 2:20 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1207
Del Pippy

Condominiums - Mandatory Homeowners Insurance Coverage - Detached Units
REMOVED: 2:20 PM

Change made: March 4, 2024 1:59 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 5, 2024 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 4, 2024 2:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 6, 2024 2:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 4, 2024 1:58 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 8, 2024 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 9:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 6, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HBs 566, 594, 723, 784, 894, 962, 1012, 1134, and 1155.

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 8:57 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1148
The Spkr (Atty Gen Ofc)

Health Care Facilities – Notice to Consumers – Out–of–Network Status (Health Care Provider Out–of–Network Information Act)
REMOVED: 8:57 AM

Health and Social Services Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 11:08 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 4, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange
DHS Child Support Administration
DHS Office of Home Energy Programs

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 9:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
March 7, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HBs 499, 806, 959, and 1053.

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 1:00 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 12, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB1346
Dels Clippinger and Pena-Melnyk

Competency Evaluations and Commitment Orders - Modification

Other
Hall of Records Commission
Change made: March 4, 2024 1:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Hall of Records Commission - Other
June 13, 2024 2:00 PM
Google Meet Video Conference
Semi-annual meeting of the Hall of Records Commission

Harford
Change made: March 4, 2024 1:54 PM - HEARING ADDED
Harford - Other
March 7, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Meeting

Click to return on the top page