Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/20/2024 11:20:00 PM
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: February 20, 2024 5:32 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 23, 2024 10:00 AM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0971
Sen Guzzone

Howard County - Class D Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Delivery
REMOVED: 5:32 PM

House
Banking, Consumer Protection, and Commercial Law
Change made: February 20, 2024 10:59 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Banking, Consumer Protection, and Commercial Law - Other
February 21, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Education Subcommittee
Change made: February 20, 2024 1:48 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education Subcommittee - Work Session
February 21, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 20, 2024 5:48 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0370
Del Vogel

Maryland Department of Health - Study on the Effects of and Preparedness for Long COVID-19
REMOVED: 5:48 PM

Change made: February 20, 2024 5:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
February 23, 2024 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 20, 2024 4:58 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2024 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1123
Del Kerr

Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Care Facilities – Cybersecurity for Hospitals
REMOVED: 4:58 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 20, 2024 6:47 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Work Session
February 21, 2024 4:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB814 - The Speaker and Del Clippinger - Juvenile Law - Reform

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: February 20, 2024 4:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
February 21, 2024 9:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB576

Other
Anne Arundel
Change made: February 20, 2024 12:42 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Anne Arundel - Other
February 23, 2024 8:15 AM
(Previous Date/Time: February 23, 2024 8:30 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting

Change made: February 20, 2024 12:43 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Anne Arundel - Other
March 1, 2024 8:15 AM
(Previous Date/Time: March 1, 2024 8:30 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting

Change made: February 20, 2024 12:44 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Anne Arundel - Other
March 8, 2024 8:15 AM
(Previous Date/Time: March 8, 2024 8:30 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page