Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/6/2023 11:23:22 AM
Monday, February 6, 2023
Monday, February 6, 2023
House
Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 6, 2023 11:12 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0615
Del Amprey

Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals - Extension of Dates
ADDED: 11:12 AM

Change made: February 6, 2023 11:17 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 23, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0489
Del R. Lewis

Residential Service Agencies - Reimbursement - Personal Assistance Services
HB0490
Del R. Lewis

Residential Service Agencies - Employee Registry
HB0583
Del Cardin

Health Insurance – Podiatrists – Reimbursement for Infusion of Medication
HB0588
Del Cullison, et al

Health Insurance - Qualified Resident Enrollment Program (Access to Care Act)
HB0604
Del Qi

Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans Issued Through Professional Employer Organizations - Exemption
HB0614
Del Cullison, et al

Department of Aging - Dementia Care Navigation Programs

Change made: February 6, 2023 11:18 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 2, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0539
Dels M. Morgan and Kipke

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
ADDED: 11:18 AM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 6, 2023 10:46 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0555
The Spkr (Md Jud)

Baltimore County - Circuit Court Judgeships
ADDED: 10:46 AM
HB0589
Del Grammer

Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Expiration and Renewal Periods for Retired Law Enforcement Officer
ADDED: 10:46 AM
HB0591
Del Buckel

Criminal Procedure - Restitution Orders - Recording Fees
ADDED: 10:46 AM
HB0610
Del Cardin

Estates - Execution of a Will - Witness Requirements
ADDED: 10:46 AM

Other
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: February 6, 2023 10:16 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
February 14, 2023 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission (CHRC)

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Change made: February 6, 2023 10:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
February 21, 2023 9:30 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
Meeting of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports (Consortium)

Click to return on the top page