Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 5/30/2023 7:43:09 PM
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: May 30, 2023 9:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
June 8, 2023 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting

Financial Education and Capability Commission
Change made: May 30, 2023 8:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
May 30, 2023 10:00 AM to May 30, 2023 11:30 AM
Virtual Meeting
First meeting of the year to review the legislative session and an overview of the Commission.

Change made: May 30, 2023 10:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
September 5, 2023 10:00 AM to September 5, 2023 11:30 AM
Virtual Meeting
Student Loan Debt

Change made: May 30, 2023 10:09 AM - HEARING ADDED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
October 10, 2023 1:00 PM to October 10, 2023 2:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
Meeting to discuss financial education.

Change made: May 30, 2023 10:12 AM - HEARING ADDED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
November 2, 2023 1:00 PM to November 2, 2023 2:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
Meeting to discuss various issues on financial capability.

Click to return on the top page