Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/17/2022 1:41:37 PM
Monday, January 17, 2022
Monday, January 17, 2022
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 11:03 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0131
Sen Kelley

Public Service Commission – Rate Suspension Proceedings
SB0142
Sen Beidle

State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
SB0256
Sen Beidle

Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
SB0257
Sen Beidle

Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements

Change made: January 17, 2022 11:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0060
Sen Feldman

Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records
REMOVED: 11:09 AM

House
Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 10:31 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
January 27, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Maryland Department of Health’s Behavioral Health Administrative Service Organization (Optum) Issues

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: January 17, 2022 1:40 PM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Overview
January 19, 2022 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 17, 2022 1:40 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Overview
January 20, 2022 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 9:47 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0139
Del Luedtke

State Personnel – Professional Service – Juvenile Services Education Teachers and Correction Education Teachers
HB0150
Dels Charkoudian and Solomon

Public Schools - Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
HB0154
Del Palakovich Carr

Public Schools - Anaphylactic Food Allergies - Guidelines and Requirements
HB0192
Del Ebersole

Baltimore County Board of Education – Student Member – Voting
HB0194
Del Shetty

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
HB0196
Del Thiam

Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs
HB0200
Del Amprey

Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: January 17, 2022 1:18 PM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
January 20, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Business Meeting.

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Change made: January 17, 2022 1:13 PM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
January 20, 2022 3:30 PM to January 20, 2022 4:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore County Public School discussion with Superintendent Darryl Williams.

Click to return on the top page