Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/27/2021 7:21:55 PM
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
Other
Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on
Change made: October 27, 2021 3:44 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on - Other
November 12, 2021 2:00 PM to November 12, 2021 3:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: November 12, 2021 2:00 PM to 3:00 PM)
Virtual/In Person Meeting
Discuss recommendations for upcoming legislative session.

Change made: October 27, 2021 3:50 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on - Other
December 2, 2021 2:00 PM to December 2, 2021 3:30 PM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
Vote on recommendations for upcoming legislative session and final report.

Maryland Economic Development Commission
Change made: October 27, 2021 8:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Economic Development Commission - Other
November 16, 2021 11:30 AM
Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce, TEDCO, MEDCO, and MARBICO Annual Reports; and MEDAAF Annual Industry Review.

Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board
Change made: October 27, 2021 4:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board - Other
November 8, 2021 3:00 PM
Conference Call
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board

Click to return on the top page