Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 12/6/2022 10:36:52 PM
Tuesday, December 6, 2022
Tuesday, December 6, 2022
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: December 6, 2022 10:06 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
December 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Regular Board Meeting

Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR)
Change made: December 6, 2022 11:38 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Other
December 8, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Proposed Regulations: DLS Control Nos. 22-406 and 22-407
REMOVED: 11:38 AM
Proposed Regulation: DLS Control No. 22-406
ADDED: 11:38 AM
Proposed Regulation: DLS Control No. 22-407
ADDED: 11:38 AM

Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board
Change made: December 6, 2022 3:46 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board - Other
December 12, 2022 9:00 AM to December 12, 2022 10:30 AM
Zoom Meeting
General Meeting and Closed Session

Click to return on the top page