Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/3/2023 9:40:31 AM
Friday, February 3, 2023
Friday, February 3, 2023
House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Change made: February 3, 2023 9:29 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 6, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 6, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
University System of Maryland Overview

Change made: February 3, 2023 9:38 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 13, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 13, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
MSDE Early Childhood Development

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 3, 2023 8:55 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0286
Del Shetty

Perfusionists – Licensure Exemption – Employees and Agents of Federally Designated Organ Procurement Organizations
REMOVED: 8:55 AM

Other
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board
Change made: February 3, 2023 8:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board - Other
February 6, 2023 9:00 AM to February 6, 2023 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
General Meeting

Click to return on the top page