Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 9/21/2021 5:06:26 PM
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
Other
Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
Change made: September 21, 2021 11:57 AM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology - Other
September 29, 2021 2:00 PM to September 29, 2021 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
1) State Legacy Systems
2) Cybersecurity Best Practices

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Change made: September 21, 2021 10:29 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
November 15, 2021 3:00 PM to November 15, 2021 5:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: November 11, 2021 3:00 PM to 5:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Click to return on the top page