Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 7/27/2021 10:05:39 PM
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
Other
Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Change made: July 27, 2021 8:24 AM - HEARING ADDED
Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on - Other
September 16, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health

Change made: July 27, 2021 8:25 AM - HEARING ADDED
Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on - Other
October 21, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland

Change made: July 27, 2021 8:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on - Other
November 18, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland

Change made: July 27, 2021 8:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on - Other
December 16, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Change made: July 27, 2021 12:30 PM - HEARING ADDED
Sports Wagering Application Review Commission - Other
August 16, 2021 8:00 AM to August 16, 2021 10:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Click to return on the top page