Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/18/2022 5:48:25 PM
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 18, 2022 10:40 AM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
January 25, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Office of Legislative Audits: Review of Certain Emergency Procurements Related to the State of Maryland's COVID-19 Response

Change made: January 18, 2022 12:30 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0267
Sen Benson

Income Tax – Healthy Indoor Air Quality Tax Credit
SB0272
Sen Guzzone (Comptroller)

Disclosure of Tax Information - Fraud Identification, Prevention, or Response

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 18, 2022 11:53 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0070
Sen Carozza, et al

Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
REMOVED: 11:53 AM
SB0103
Sen Augustine

State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions
REMOVED: 11:53 AM
SB0120
Sen Lam (By Request)

Acupuncture Licensure Requirements
REMOVED: 11:53 AM
SB0133
Sen Washington

State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Membership and Official Seal
REMOVED: 11:53 AM

Change made: January 18, 2022 11:54 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0070
Sen Carozza, et al

Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
ADDED: 11:54 AM
SB0103
Sen Augustine

State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions
ADDED: 11:54 AM
SB0120
Sen Lam (By Request)

Acupuncture Licensure Requirements
ADDED: 11:54 AM
SB0133
Sen Washington

State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Membership and Official Seal
ADDED: 11:54 AM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 18, 2022 10:38 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0261
Sen West

Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Operating Agreements and Partnership Agreements
ADDED: 10:38 AM
SB0265
Sen Lee, et al

Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements – Probation Not Deportation
ADDED: 10:38 AM
SB0266
Sen Benson

Department of Transportation – Vehicle Litter Reporting Program
ADDED: 10:38 AM

Change made: January 18, 2022 10:38 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0258
Sen Feldman (Dept)

Real Estate Investment Trust Modernization Act
ADDED: 10:38 AM

House
Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 18, 2022 10:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 18, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0129
Del Charkoudian

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services and Public Safety Answering Points – Modifications
ADDED: 10:23 AM
REMOVED: 10:51 AM

Change made: January 18, 2022 10:52 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0129
Del Charkoudian

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services and Public Safety Answering Points – Modifications
ADDED: 10:52 AM

Change made: January 18, 2022 10:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0227
Del Harrison

State Government – Legal and Employee Holiday – Juneteenth National Independence Day
ADDED: 10:23 AM
HB0276
Del Cullison

Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
ADDED: 10:23 AM

Change made: January 18, 2022 10:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0279
Del Rogers, et al

Veterans Affairs - Office of Communications and Public Affairs - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
ADDED: 10:23 AM
HB0286
Del Kaiser

Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date
ADDED: 10:23 AM
HB0292
Del Davis

Occupational Licensing Boards and Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Reporting Disciplinary Activities
ADDED: 10:23 AM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 18, 2022 1:44 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
January 19, 2022 11:15 AM
(Previous Date/Time: January 19, 2022 11:00 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Bureau of Revenue Estimates

Change made: January 18, 2022 4:53 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0015
Dels Luedtke and D. Jones

Invasive and Native Plants – Classification, Listing, Use, and Sales and Use Tax
REMOVED: 4:09 PM
ADDED: 4:53 PM

Other
Board of Public Works
Change made: January 18, 2022 10:15 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Board of Public Works - Other
March 9, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting
REMOVED: 10:15 AM
General Meeting and Bond Sale
ADDED: 10:15 AM

Click to return on the top page