Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/2/2023 11:25:15 PM
Monday, October 2, 2023
Monday, October 2, 2023
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: October 2, 2023 3:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Briefing
November 14, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
1. Updates from Maryland Insurance Administration and Maryland Health Benefit Exchange on health insurance-related matters.
2. Briefing from Maryland Department of Health on matters relating to health occupations boards.

Other
Hall of Records Commission
Change made: October 2, 2023 7:19 AM - HEARING ADDED
Hall of Records Commission - Other
November 7, 2023 2:00 PM to November 7, 2023 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Semi-annual meeting of the Hall of Records Commission.

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Change made: October 2, 2023 10:01 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee - Other
October 26, 2023 1:00 PM to October 26, 2023 3:00 PM
Webex-Teleconference
TBD

Maryland Military Installation Council
Change made: October 2, 2023 11:52 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Military Installation Council - Other
December 11, 2023 8:00 AM
100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
Maryland Military Installation Council Meeting

Click to return on the top page