Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/6/2023 12:18:08 PM
Monday, February 6, 2023
Monday, February 6, 2023
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: February 6, 2023 11:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
February 7, 2023 2:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 6, 2023 12:10 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0143
Sen Feldman

Electricity – Net Energy Metering – Accrual of Net Excess Generation (Net Metering Flexibility Act)
SB0332
Sen Hayes

Maryland African American Museum Corporation - Board of Directors - Membership
SB0371
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City - Commercial Use - Definition
SB0382
Sen M. Washington

Accessory Dwelling Unit Promotion and Policy Task Force
SB0443
Sen Brooks

Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Alterations
SB0444
Sen Brooks

State Board of Electricians - Limited Energy Contractors and Limited Energy Integrators - Licensing
SB0445
Sen Hayes

Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program - Alterations
SB0473
Sen Klausmeier

Commission to Establish a Memorial to the Global War on Terror
SB0489
Sen Brooks

Public Service Commission - Certificates of Public Convenience and Necessity - Local Permits
SB0490
Sen Brooks

Department of Veterans Affairs – Burial in State Veterans’ Cemeteries – Spouses and Dependents

Finance Committee
Change made: February 6, 2023 12:05 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0519
Charles County Senators

Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unlicensed Establishments
ADDED: 12:05 PM

House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 6, 2023 12:06 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0567
Del R. Lewis

Residential Property - Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Authority to Establish Condominium Regimes
ADDED: 12:06 PM
HB0577
Dels Fennell and D. Barnes

Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
ADDED: 12:06 PM
HB0608
Del Lehman, et al

Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Service Dogs and Guide Dogs
ADDED: 12:06 PM
HB0625
Del Amprey

Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program - Alterations
ADDED: 12:06 PM

Change made: February 6, 2023 12:08 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0602
Del Stein

Environment - State Wetlands - Shoreline Restoration
ADDED: 12:08 PM
HB0607
Del Love

Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Stormwater Associated With Construction Activity
ADDED: 12:08 PM
HB0609
Del Smith (BCA)

Environment - Waste Haulers - Reporting Requirement
ADDED: 12:08 PM
HB0612
Del Watson

Natural Resources - Licensed Tree Experts - Alterations
ADDED: 12:08 PM
HB0624
Del Amprey

Environment - Suppliers of Water - Notification Requirements
ADDED: 12:08 PM
HB0631
Del Stein

Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
ADDED: 12:08 PM
HB0635
Dels Wivell and Valentine

Water Pollution Control - Discharges From Construction Sites - Limits on Liability
ADDED: 12:08 PM

Change made: February 6, 2023 12:10 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 23, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0106
Del Williams

State Finance – Prohibited Appropriations – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
HB0491
Del Bridges, et al

Transportation – Commission to Study Establishing a Baltimore Regional Transit Authority
HB0550
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Maryland Energy Administration – Energy Programs – Modifications (Clean Transportation and Energy Act)

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 6, 2023 11:12 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0615
Del Amprey

Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals - Extension of Dates
ADDED: 11:12 AM

Change made: February 6, 2023 11:17 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 23, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0489
Del R. Lewis

Residential Service Agencies - Reimbursement - Personal Assistance Services
HB0490
Del R. Lewis

Residential Service Agencies - Employee Registry
HB0583
Del Cardin

Health Insurance – Podiatrists – Reimbursement for Infusion of Medication
HB0588
Del Cullison, et al

Health Insurance - Qualified Resident Enrollment Program (Access to Care Act)
HB0604
Del Qi

Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans Issued Through Professional Employer Organizations - Exemption
HB0614
Del Cullison, et al

Department of Aging - Dementia Care Navigation Programs

Change made: February 6, 2023 11:18 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 2, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0539
Dels M. Morgan and Kipke

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
ADDED: 11:18 AM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 6, 2023 10:46 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0555
The Spkr (Md Jud)

Baltimore County - Circuit Court Judgeships
ADDED: 10:46 AM
HB0589
Del Grammer

Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Expiration and Renewal Periods for Retired Law Enforcement Officer
ADDED: 10:46 AM
HB0591
Del Buckel

Criminal Procedure - Restitution Orders - Recording Fees
ADDED: 10:46 AM
HB0610
Del Cardin

Estates - Execution of a Will - Witness Requirements
ADDED: 10:46 AM

Other
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: February 6, 2023 10:16 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
February 14, 2023 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission (CHRC)

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Change made: February 6, 2023 10:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
February 21, 2023 9:30 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
Meeting of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports (Consortium)

Click to return on the top page