Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/25/2022 11:18:12 AM
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 25, 2022 11:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0250
Sen Hayes

State and Local Procurement – Payment Practices
ADDED: 11:09 AM
SJ0004
The Pres (By Request)

Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
ADDED: 11:09 AM

Change made: January 25, 2022 11:09 AM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
SB0231
Sen Jackson

Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
SB0346
Sen Jackson

State Police Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations

Finance Committee
Change made: January 25, 2022 9:20 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0142
Sen Beidle

State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
REMOVED: 9:20 AM

Pensions Subcommittee
Change made: January 25, 2022 11:09 AM - HEARING ADDED
Pensions Subcommittee - Other
February 10, 2022 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

House
Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 25, 2022 9:50 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0309
Del Long

Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Pilot Program
HB0310
Del Boyce

Baltimore City – Property Taxes – Authority to Set Special Rates
HB0313
Del Novotny

Election Law - Recall Elections
HB0320
Del Wilkins

General Assembly - Residency Requirement - Enforcement - Factors
HB0327
Del D. Jones

Elections - Election Judges - Minimum Compensation
HB0328
Del D. Jones

Elections - Polling Place Location Restrictions - Repeal
HB0332
Del Long

Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit
HB0340
Del D. Jones

Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
HB0344
Del Palakovich Carr

Election Law - Campaign Finance - Contributions (Prohibiting Pay to Play Act of 2022)
HB0362
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22
HB0394
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Municipal Tax Setoff, School Facilities Surcharge, and Public Safety and Behavioral Health Surcharge - Reports PG 402-22

Other
Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Change made: January 25, 2022 10:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board - Other
March 11, 2022 10:30 AM to March 11, 2022 12:30 PM
Google Meet Video Conference
The Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board will meet virtually to discuss issues pertaining to the life sciences and medical technology communities.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: January 25, 2022 7:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
January 28, 2022 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Delegation Virtual Bill Hearing

Click to return on the top page