Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/28/2021 4:18:39 PM
Thursday, October 28, 2021
Thursday, October 28, 2021
Other
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Change made: October 28, 2021 12:46 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families - Briefing
November 10, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefings on the impacts of the COVID-19 pandemic on child care in Maryland.

OIS Testing
Change made: October 28, 2021 8:40 AM - HEARING ADDED
OIS Testing - Other
October 28, 2021 6:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube

Spending Affordability Committee
Change made: October 28, 2021 9:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
Spending Affordability Committee - Other
December 15, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Decision Meeting

State Park Investment Commission
Change made: October 28, 2021 1:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
State Park Investment Commission - Other
November 9, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Department of Recreation and Parks invited speaker presentation and discussion.

Click to return on the top page