Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/22/2023 11:26:48 AM
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: March 22, 2023 10:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Work Session
March 22, 2023 3:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB 326 - Natural Resources - Forest Preservation and Retention

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: March 22, 2023 10:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
March 27, 2023 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: March 22, 2023 10:34 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
March 27, 2023 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: March 22, 2023 10:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 28, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
HB0034
Del Hill, et al

Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Prohibition on Rent Increases and Shielding of Court Records
HB0052
Del Foley

Condominiums - Sales Contracts - Asbestos Disclosure
HB0105
Del Holmes

Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
HB0151
Del Wells

Real Property - Residential Leases - Notification of Rent Increases
HB0287
Del Fair

Public Health - Prohibition on Transfer of Human Immunodeficiency Virus - Repeal
HB0331
Del Terrasa, et al

Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings
HB0434
Del Charles

Maryland Condominium Act – Amendments to the Declaration
HB0833
Del Holmes

Homeowners Associations - Recorded Liens - Voting Prohibition
HB1174
Calvert County Delegation

Calvert County - Civil Infractions - Prosecutorial Designations

Change made: March 22, 2023 10:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 29, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
HB0219
St. Mary's County Delegation*

St. Mary's County - Golf Carts on Public Highways - Report
HB0391
Del Healey, et al

Vehicle Laws - Parking Enforcement - Citations
HB0416
Del Amprey

Resources and Education for All Prisons (REAP) Act
HB0435
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 304-23
HB0519
Dels D. Jones and Bagnall

Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Authorizations and Requirements
HB0747
Del Pasteur, et al

Correctional Services - Inmate Employment - Agricultural Work
HB0761
Del Phillips, et al

Correctional Services - Inmate Labor - Alterations
HB0819
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg

Montgomery County - Off-Street Parking Requirements Near Mass Transit Stations MC/PG 106-23
HB0820
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) - Speed Limit Enforcement MC 8-23
HB0849
Del Moon, et al

School Bus Stops - Violations - Enforcement and Safety Measures
HB0999
Del Fair

Corporations - Filing Requirements for Dissolution and Termination of Registration or Qualification - Repeal
HB1002
Dels Foley and Barve

Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Alterations
HB1173
Del Stein

Motor Vehicles - Recreational Vehicle Dealer Agreements
HB1194
Dels Wivell and Valentine

Town of Sharpsburg - Parking of Vehicles - Restrictions
HB1207
Dels Miller and McComas

Motor Vehicles - Motorcycles - Passenger Restrictions

Change made: March 22, 2023 10:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
HB0135
Dels Moon and Williams

Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances and Firearms
HB0336
Dels Terrasa and Moon

Courts - Expert Witnesses - Letter of Exception
HB0362
Del Simpson, et al

Intercepted Communications - Penalty
HB0980
Del Young, et al

Criminal Procedure - Probation, Parole, and Pretrial Release Violations - Cannabis Use
HB1032
Del Phillips, et al

Criminal Procedure - Protection of Identity of Minor Victim
HB1071
Del Crutchfield, et al

Criminal Law and Procedure - Cannabis - Fines for Smoking in Public, Stops, and Searches
HB1175
Del Valentine, et al

Criminal Procedure - Hunting Offenses - Expungement
HB1176
Del Atterbeary, et al

Public Safety - Voluntary 9-1-1 Registry

House
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee
Change made: March 22, 2023 11:12 AM - HEARING ADDED
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Work Session
March 23, 2023 10:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: March 22, 2023 9:17 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
March 29, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
SB0271
Sen Ready

Education - Maryland Civic Excellence Program - Established
ADDED: 9:17 AM
SB0350
Sen King, et al

Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations
ADDED: 9:17 AM
SB0402
Sen Hershey

Kent County - Board of Education - Student Member
ADDED: 9:17 AM

Other
No. 6 - Montgomery County
Change made: March 22, 2023 10:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 6 - Montgomery County - Other
March 24, 2023 10:30 AM
State House Caucus Room, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD 21401
Voting Session

Click to return on the top page