Update Report
As of: 3/21/2023 11:32:05 AM
Change made: March 21, 2023 11:13 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 23, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
HB0686
Del Queen
Financial Regulation - Modernizing Licensing of Non-Depository Institutions and Elimination of Branch License Requirements
ADDED: 10:47 AM
HB0870
Del Guyton
Division of Rehabilitation Services and Developmental Disabilities Administration - Memorandum of Understanding
ADDED: 10:47 AM
HB1006
Del Ruth
State Highway Administration - Vegetation Management - Pollinator Habitat Plan
ADDED: 10:47 AM
HB1150
Del Queen
Commercial Law and Financial Institutions - Credit Regulation - Shared Appreciation Agreements
ADDED: 10:47 AM
HB1156
Del R. Lewis, et al
Pharmacists - Therapy Management Contract - Form
ADDED: 10:47 AM
HB1159
Del Cullison, et al
State Board of Dental Examiners - University of Maryland School of Dentistry Faculty - Qualifying for Examination
ADDED: 10:47 AM
HB1272
Dels Bagnall and Rosenberg
Maryland Insurance Commissioner Enforcement - Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims - Sunset Extension
ADDED: 10:47 AM
HB1146
Del Kipke, et al
Maryland Department of Health and Maryland Health Care Commission - Dental Services - Survey and Regional Needs Assessment
ADDED: 11:13 AM
Change made: March 21, 2023 11:13 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 28, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
HB0146
Howard County Delegation
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Public Hearing Ho. Co. 13-23
HB0158
Howard County Delegation
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirements Ho. Co. 11-23
HB0218
Howard County Delegation
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Petition of Support Requirement Ho. Co. 12-23
HB0258
Del Arentz, et al
Caroline and Queen Anne's Counties - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirement
HB0644
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Golf Simulator Facility
HB0670
Harford County Delegation
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
HB0679
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Display of License
HB0939
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
HB0989
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Miniature Golf Course License
HB0990
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B–HTF (Hatchet Throwing Facility) License
HB0991
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
HB0997
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
HB1062
Harford County Delegation
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alteration of License Quota
Change made: March 21, 2023 11:13 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 29, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
HB0357
Del Kipke, et al
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law
HB0374
Del Kipke, et al
Health Insurance – Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Audits of Pharmacies and Pharmacists
HB0382
Del Kipke, et al
Maryland Department of Health and Prescription Drug Affordability Board - Managed Care Organizations and Prescription Drug Claims - Study
HB0489
Del R. Lewis
Residential Service Agencies - Reimbursement - Personal Assistance Services
HB0695
Dels Sample-Hughes and Adams
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Allocation of Grants (Rural Communities Improvement Act of 2023)
HB0962
Del Alston
Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
Change made: March 21, 2023 9:39 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 21, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0956
Sen Hershey
Corporations and Associations - Cooperatives - Nonescheat Capital Credits
REMOVED: 9:39 AM
Change made: March 21, 2023 10:16 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 22, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
HB0232
Del Williams
Child in Need of Assistance – Neglect – Cannabis Use
REMOVED: 10:16 AM
Change made: March 21, 2023 9:06 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
March 23, 2023 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
bill_number
bill_number
bill_number
bill_number
bill_number
bill_number
bill_number