Update Report
As of: 3/28/2023 3:23:41 PM
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 3:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 28, 2023 2:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Other
April 3, 2023 4:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 28, 2023 11:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 2:30 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
HB0283
Del Kaiser, et al
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Gender-Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act)
HB0322
Del Bagnall, et al
Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
HB0611
Del Kelly, et al
State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership
HB1148
Del Moon, et al
Behavioral Health Care - Treatment and Access (Behavioral Health Model for Maryland)
SB0582
Sen Augustine
Behavioral Health Care - Treatment and Access (Behavioral Health Model for Maryland)
SB0960
Sen Kelly
State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership
Change made: March 28, 2023 10:37 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 2:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 28, 2023 10:48 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 2:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 28, 2023 11:58 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0574
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
REMOVED: 11:58 AM
Change made: March 28, 2023 1:17 PM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 28, 2023 11:14 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0208
Del Lehman, et al
Street Racing and Exhibition Driving - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties
ADDED: 11:14 AM
Change made: March 28, 2023 2:58 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:27 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 29, 2023 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB 480 and SB 286.
ADDED: 9:27 AM
Change made: March 28, 2023 1:25 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 2:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
SB0460
Sen M. Washington, et al
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act)
ADDED: 1:25 PM
SB0534
Sen Gile, et al
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2023
ADDED: 1:25 PM
SB0581
Sens Klausmeier and Mautz
Behavioral Health Care Coordination Value-Based Purchasing Pilot Program
ADDED: 1:25 PM
SB0798
Sen Ferguson, et al
Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
ADDED: 1:25 PM
Change made: March 28, 2023 10:03 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
March 28, 2023 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:50 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Utilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 28, 2023 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Anne Arundel - Other
March 29, 2023 10:45 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Votes
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:51 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Anne Arundel - Other
March 31, 2023 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County House Delegation Meeting
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Briefing
March 31, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing-Maryland Public Defender Natasha Dartigue
Change made: March 28, 2023 2:38 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Harford - Other
March 30, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Harford County Delegation Meeting
Change made: March 28, 2023 2:14 PM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
April 20, 2023 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.
Change made: March 28, 2023 1:55 PM - HEARING UPDATED
State Debt, Commission on - Other
April 18, 2023 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: Virtual Meeting)
Annual meeting to recommend a State tax rate on real and personal property