Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/17/2022 10:35:13 PM
Monday, January 17, 2022
Monday, January 17, 2022
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 4:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0009
Sen West

Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Qualification and Certification
SB0059
Sen McCray

Maryland Transportation Authority - Options for the Payment of Tolls and Civil Penalties
SB0174
Chr B&T (Dept)

Mortality and Quality Review Committee - Duties, Reports, and Data - Sunset Extension
SB0192
Chr B&T (Dept)

State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
SB0228
Sen Ferguson

Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
SB0235
Sen Jackson

Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
SB0236
Sen Salling

Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
SB0240
Sen Simonaire

Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Sewing Items
SB0245
Sen Kagan

Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
SB0247
Sen Hayes

State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
SB0248
Sen Hayes

Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises
SB0251
Sen Hayes

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Centenarians
SB0260
Sen West

Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund - Established
SB0264
Sen Elfreth, et al

Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Energy and Property Taxes

Change made: January 17, 2022 4:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2022 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
SB0047
Sen Carter

Pensions and Retirement - Forfeiture of Benefits - Law Enforcement Officers
SB0115
Sen Jackson

Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefits
SB0141
Sen Carter

Pensions and Retirement – Forfeiture of Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers

Finance Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 11:03 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0131
Sen Kelley

Public Service Commission – Rate Suspension Proceedings
SB0142
Sen Beidle

State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
SB0256
Sen Beidle

Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
SB0257
Sen Beidle

Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements

Change made: January 17, 2022 11:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0060
Sen Feldman

Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records
REMOVED: 11:09 AM

Pensions Subcommittee
Change made: January 17, 2022 4:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Pensions Subcommittee - Other
January 27, 2022 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 3:28 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 20, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0036
Del Attar

Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
REMOVED: 3:28 PM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 10:31 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
January 27, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Maryland Department of Health’s Behavioral Health Administrative Service Organization (Optum) Issues

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: January 17, 2022 1:40 PM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Overview
January 19, 2022 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 17, 2022 1:40 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Overview
January 20, 2022 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee
Change made: January 17, 2022 1:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Overview
January 20, 2022 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: January 17, 2022 3:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
January 24, 2022 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on 9-8-8: Suicide Prevention Hotline
The Health Services Cost Review Commission’s report on Behavioral Health Emergency Department Wait Times and Service Improvements in Maryland

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 9:47 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0139
Del Luedtke

State Personnel – Professional Service – Juvenile Services Education Teachers and Correction Education Teachers
HB0150
Dels Charkoudian and Solomon

Public Schools - Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
HB0154
Del Palakovich Carr

Public Schools - Anaphylactic Food Allergies - Guidelines and Requirements
HB0192
Del Ebersole

Baltimore County Board of Education – Student Member – Voting
HB0194
Del Shetty

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
HB0196
Del Thiam

Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs
HB0200
Del Amprey

Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement

Change made: January 17, 2022 3:58 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0282
Dels D. Jones and Crosby

Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
ADDED: 3:58 PM
HB0288
Dels Crosby and D. Jones

Sales and Use Tax - Baby Products - Exemption
ADDED: 3:58 PM

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: January 17, 2022 1:18 PM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
January 20, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Business Meeting.

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Change made: January 17, 2022 1:13 PM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
January 20, 2022 3:30 PM to January 20, 2022 4:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore County Public School discussion with Superintendent Darryl Williams.

Click to return on the top page