Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/21/2024 11:24:13 AM
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
House
Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: February 21, 2024 11:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Work Session
February 22, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 21, 2024 9:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 8, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1161
Dorchester County Delegation

Dorchester County - Sanitary Commission - Transfer of Powers to County Council
ADDED: 9:23 AM

Other
Harford
Change made: February 21, 2024 10:28 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Harford - Other
February 22, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Meeting

Howard
Change made: February 21, 2024 9:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
February 28, 2024 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation meeting on proposed local bills and bonds.

Change made: February 21, 2024 9:01 AM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
March 6, 2024 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation meeting on proposed local bills and bonds.

Click to return on the top page