Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/21/2021 11:34:34 PM
Thursday, October 21, 2021
Thursday, October 21, 2021
Senate
Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: October 21, 2021 12:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Other
November 15, 2021 9:00 AM
Site Visit

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: October 21, 2021 11:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
November 9, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget.

Other
Board of Public Works
Change made: October 21, 2021 12:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
November 3, 2021 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: October 21, 2021 12:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
November 17, 2021 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: October 21, 2021 12:54 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
December 1, 2021 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: October 21, 2021 12:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
December 15, 2021 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: October 21, 2021 1:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
January 5, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Financial Education and Capability Commission
Change made: October 21, 2021 8:47 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
October 21, 2021 10:00 AM to October 21, 2021 11:30 AM
Virtual Meeting
Discuss topics related to financial education and expanding capability.

Click to return on the top page