Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/4/2022 10:23:35 PM
Tuesday, October 4, 2022
Tuesday, October 4, 2022
House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: October 4, 2022 4:25 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Other
October 5, 2022 10:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD

Other
Maryland Economic Development Commission
Change made: October 4, 2022 11:45 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Economic Development Commission - Other
November 15, 2022 12:00 PM
Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce and the Governor's Subcabinet on Infrastructure.

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Change made: October 4, 2022 9:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee - Other
October 27, 2022 1:00 PM to October 27, 2022 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
TBD

Click to return on the top page