Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/21/2024 9:26:39 AM
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 21, 2024 9:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 8, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1161
Dorchester County Delegation

Dorchester County - Sanitary Commission - Transfer of Powers to County Council
ADDED: 9:23 AM

Other
Howard
Change made: February 21, 2024 9:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
February 28, 2024 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation meeting on proposed local bills and bonds.

Change made: February 21, 2024 9:01 AM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
March 6, 2024 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation meeting on proposed local bills and bonds.

Click to return on the top page