Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/29/2024 1:21:31 PM
Thursday, February 29, 2024
Thursday, February 29, 2024
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 11:58 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0731
Sen Carter

State Facilities – Procedures for Changes and Closures – Definition and Reporting
REMOVED: 11:58 AM

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 9:36 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2024 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
SB1007
Sen Hayes

State Government - Executive Appointments

House
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: February 29, 2024 9:26 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0059
Del Mangione

Crimes of Violence - Motor Vehicle Theft
REMOVED: 9:26 AM
HB0359
Del J. Long, et al

Petition for Guardianship of the Property of Alleged Disabled Person - Stay of Civil Actions and Proceedings
ADDED: 9:26 AM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 12:21 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2024 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1359
Del Rosenberg, et al

Facilities - Disabilities and Juveniles - Community Relations Plans
REMOVED: 12:21 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 11:03 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB1298
Del Young

Family Law - Paternity - Surname (Maryland Paternal Naming Rights Act)
REMOVED: 11:03 AM

Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 29, 2024 9:22 AM - HEARING ADDED
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1202
Del Fisher, et al

Amendments Convention Called Under Article V of the U.S. Constitution - Delegation to the Convention
HJ0002
Del Acevero, et al

Supporting a Long-Term Ceasefire in Israel and Palestine
HJ0003
Del Williams, et al

Use of Nuclear Weapons
HJ0006
Del Jacobs, et al

Commercial Fishery Disaster Declaration Due to Invasive Species
HJ0008
Del Martinez, et al

Condemning Islamophobia, Anti-Palestinian Hate, and Antisemitism

Click to return on the top page