Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/18/2021 4:48:10 PM
Monday, October 18, 2021
Monday, October 18, 2021
Other
Howard
Change made: October 18, 2021 1:25 PM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
November 16, 2021 7:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation hearing on proposed local legislation.

Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds
Change made: October 18, 2021 3:41 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds - Other
October 20, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Update from Comptroller, Treasurer, and Office of Legislative Audits.
REMOVED: 3:41 PM
Update from Comptroller, Treasurer, Office of Legislative Audits, and Maryland Municipal League.
ADDED: 3:41 PM

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: October 18, 2021 8:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
October 19, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting to discuss the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission release of the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Change made: October 18, 2021 9:29 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
October 21, 2021 4:30 PM
Meritus Medical Center, 11110 Medical Campus Road, Suite 142, Hagerstown, MD 21742
Informational meeting to the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals

Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study
Change made: October 18, 2021 2:37 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study - Other
October 28, 2021 11:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Meeting to fulfill mandate of House Bill 681.

Change made: October 18, 2021 2:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study - Other
November 4, 2021 11:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Meeting to fulfill mandate of House Bill 681.

Change made: October 18, 2021 2:40 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study - Other
November 18, 2021 11:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Meeting to fulfill the mandate of House Bill 681.

Change made: October 18, 2021 2:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study - Other
December 2, 2021 11:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Meeting to fulfill the mandate of House Bill 681.

Change made: October 18, 2021 2:43 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study - Other
December 16, 2021 11:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Meeting to fulfill the mandate of House Bill 681.

OIS Testing
Change made: October 18, 2021 9:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
OIS Testing - Other
October 18, 2021 6:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: October 18, 2021 2:49 PM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
November 18, 2021 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page