Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/20/2021 2:57:18 PM
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: October 20, 2021 12:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
November 10, 2021 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting

Other
Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study
Change made: October 20, 2021 11:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study - Other
November 5, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Third Meeting

Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
Change made: October 20, 2021 2:56 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology - Other
November 9, 2021 10:00 AM to November 9, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
A discussion of State Security laws and other issues.

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: October 20, 2021 9:01 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
October 26, 2021 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals. CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the October 21 meeting at Meritus Medical Center.

Change made: October 20, 2021 9:22 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
October 26, 2021 4:30 PM
Coppin State University, Tawes Ballroom, 2500 W. North Ave., (Park in Lot F), Baltimore, MD 21216
Informational Meeting to the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Change made: October 20, 2021 9:34 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
October 28, 2021 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals. CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the October 26 meeting at Coppin State University.

Click to return on the top page