Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 9/16/2021 6:07:14 PM
Thursday, September 16, 2021
Thursday, September 16, 2021
House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: September 16, 2021 12:19 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
September 22, 2021 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Update on federal funding distributed to the State
ADDED: 12:19 PM

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Change made: September 16, 2021 12:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On - Other
November 10, 2021 5:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Hall of Records Commission
Change made: September 16, 2021 10:42 AM - HEARING ADDED
Hall of Records Commission - Other
November 4, 2021 2:00 PM
Google Meet Video Conference
Semi annual meeting of the Hall of Records Commission.

Joint Committee on Pensions
Change made: September 16, 2021 3:21 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Pensions - Other
October 7, 2021 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on State Retirement and Pension System Climate Risk Investment Policies and Procedures.
Briefing on Climate Initiatives.
Overview of Legal and Fiduciary Duties of the State Retirement and Pension System.

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Change made: September 16, 2021 10:17 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
September 20, 2021 6:00 PM to September 20, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Click to return on the top page