Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 7/12/2024 2:14:58 PM
Friday, July 12, 2024
Friday, July 12, 2024
Other
Financial Education and Capability Commission
Change made: July 12, 2024 1:30 PM - HEARING ADDED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
July 18, 2024 2:00 PM to July 18, 2024 3:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
First meeting of the year to review the legislative session and an overview of the Commission.

Change made: July 12, 2024 1:32 PM - HEARING ADDED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
August 27, 2024 2:00 PM to August 27, 2024 3:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
Second meeting of the year to discuss economic mobility.

Change made: July 12, 2024 1:35 PM - HEARING ADDED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
September 24, 2024 2:00 PM to September 24, 2024 3:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
Third Meeting of the year to discuss financial education on college campuses.

Change made: July 12, 2024 1:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
October 29, 2024 2:00 PM to October 29, 2024 3:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
Fourth meeting of the year to discuss the report.

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: July 12, 2024 1:13 PM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
July 23, 2024 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Public virtual meeting to discuss the Public Private Partnership MOU and Project Agreement between the IAC and Prince George's County as well as the Executive Director Evaluation Policy and Form.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Change made: July 12, 2024 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Sports Wagering Application Review Commission - Other
August 21, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page