Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 12/1/2023 7:00:45 PM
Friday, December 1, 2023
Friday, December 1, 2023
House
Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: December 1, 2023 11:30 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
December 12, 2023 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Update on Commission on Behavioral Health Care Treatment and Access (House Bill 1148 of 2023)
Medicaid Public Health Emergency unwinding and redeterminations
Impact of health care expansion on uncompensated care
Report on health care and dental care coverage for undocumented individuals (Senate Bill 806 of 2023)
Study of operating room space for dental procedures (House Bill 1146 of 2023)

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: December 1, 2023 9:23 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
December 14, 2023 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Board Meeting

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Change made: December 1, 2023 12:05 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
December 13, 2023 9:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: December 13, 2023 10:00 AM)
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: Location-TBD)
Office of Legislative Audits; TBD
REMOVED: 12:05 PM
Audit: Maryland Department of Health-Medical Care Programs Administration (November 2023)
ADDED: 12:05 PM
Office of Legislative Audits
ADDED: 12:05 PM
Update: Maryland Department of Labor-Division of Unemployment Insurance
ADDED: 12:05 PM
Update: Department of Budget and Management-Audit and Finance Compliance Unit
ADDED: 12:05 PM
Audit: Maryland Department of Health-Office of the Secretary and Other Units (October 2023)
ADDED: 12:05 PM
Special Review: Maryland Transportation Authority (March 2023)
ADDED: 12:05 PM

Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Change made: December 1, 2023 4:22 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families - Other
December 6, 2023 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Multigenerational Families
Unified Application of Benefits

Click to return on the top page