Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 6/17/2024 11:10:31 PM
Monday, June 17, 2024
Monday, June 17, 2024
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: June 17, 2024 10:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
June 25, 2024 9:00 AM
Maryland State Dept. of Education, 200 West Baltimore Street, Baltimore, MD

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Change made: June 17, 2024 10:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
June 24, 2024 10:00 AM
Atman-Glazer Building, Room 164 A&B, 45 Calvert St. , Annapolis, MD 21401
Meeting of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports (Consortium).

Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board
Change made: June 17, 2024 9:50 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board - Other
June 20, 2024 11:00 AM to June 20, 2024 12:30 PM
1746 World Trade Center, 17th Floor, 401 East Pratt St. Baltimore, MD
The Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board will discuss issues pertaining to the manufacturing industry in Maryland.

Click to return on the top page