Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 6/14/2021 4:56:44 PM
Monday, June 14, 2021
Monday, June 14, 2021
House
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: June 14, 2021 2:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
June 29, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on the MDOT I-495 I-270 P3 Project

Other
Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight
Change made: June 14, 2021 3:24 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight - Briefing
June 23, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Labor on Implementation of UI Legislation.

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Change made: June 14, 2021 1:16 PM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
July 1, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Change made: June 14, 2021 3:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup - Other
June 28, 2021 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page