Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 9/16/2021 3:10:17 PM
Thursday, September 16, 2021
Thursday, September 16, 2021
House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: September 16, 2021 12:19 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
September 22, 2021 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Update on federal funding distributed to the State
ADDED: 12:19 PM

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Change made: September 16, 2021 12:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On - Other
November 10, 2021 5:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Hall of Records Commission
Change made: September 16, 2021 10:42 AM - HEARING ADDED
Hall of Records Commission - Other
November 4, 2021 2:00 PM
Google Meet Video Conference
Semi annual meeting of the Hall of Records Commission.

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Change made: September 16, 2021 10:17 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
September 20, 2021 6:00 PM to September 20, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Click to return on the top page