Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/4/2024 11:11:03 AM
Monday, March 4, 2024
Monday, March 4, 2024
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 10:26 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0936
Sen Gallion

Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
REMOVED: 10:26 AM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 10:31 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 7, 2024 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB1108
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office
ADDED: 10:31 AM

House
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 9:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 6, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HBs 566, 594, 723, 784, 894, 962, 1012, 1134, and 1155.

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 8:57 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1148
The Spkr (Atty Gen Ofc)

Health Care Facilities – Notice to Consumers – Out–of–Network Status (Health Care Provider Out–of–Network Information Act)
REMOVED: 8:57 AM

Health and Social Services Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 11:08 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 4, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange
DHS Child Support Administration
DHS Office of Home Energy Programs

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 9:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
March 7, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HBs 499, 806, 959, and 1053.

Click to return on the top page