Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 12/2/2021 5:17:47 PM
Thursday, December 2, 2021
Thursday, December 2, 2021
Senate
Rules Committee
Change made: December 2, 2021 3:10 PM - HEARING ADDED
Rules Committee - Other
December 3, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Rules Discussion

House
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: December 2, 2021 5:18 AM - HEARING ADDED
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
December 6, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0001
The Spkr (Legislative Redistricting Advis

Congressional Districting Plan
HB0002
The Spkr (Admin)

Congressional Districting Plan
HB0003
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Redistricting Plan MC 01-21SS
HB0004
Carroll County Delegation

Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan

Other
Board of Public Works
Change made: December 2, 2021 2:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
January 26, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: December 2, 2021 2:34 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
February 16, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: December 2, 2021 2:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
March 9, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: December 2, 2021 2:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
March 23, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Montgomery
Change made: December 2, 2021 12:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
December 6, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

Click to return on the top page