Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/26/2022 12:51:44 PM
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 26, 2022 11:29 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0154
Sen Eckardt

Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
ADDED: 11:29 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: January 26, 2022 10:48 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
January 27, 2022 4:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0170
Chr FIN (Dept)

Title Insurance – Insurers and Insurance Producers – Requirements
ADDED: 10:48 AM
SB0175
Chr FIN (Dept)

Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
ADDED: 10:48 AM
SB0180
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021
ADDED: 10:48 AM
SB0185
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Insurance Administration - Virtual Hearings
ADDED: 10:48 AM
SB0188
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Managing General Agents - Review Requirements
ADDED: 10:48 AM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 26, 2022 12:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
January 28, 2022 9:30 AM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Change made: January 26, 2022 12:39 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0382
Sen Lee

Intercepted Communications - Admissibility of Evidence
ADDED: 12:39 PM
SB0389
Sen Jackson

Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
ADDED: 12:39 PM
SB0392
The Pres (Admin), et al

State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Plea Agreements and Annual Report (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2022)
ADDED: 12:39 PM
SB0397
The Pres (Admin), et al

Public Safety - Local Law Enforcement Coordination Council and Coordinator and State Aid for Police Protection Fund
ADDED: 12:39 PM

Change made: January 26, 2022 12:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2022 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0384
Sen Hettleman

Landlord and Tenant - Stay of Eviction Proceeding for Rental Assistance Determination

Change made: January 26, 2022 12:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2022 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0387
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc) and Sen Lee

Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
SB0396
The Pres (Admin), et al

Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)

House
Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 26, 2022 10:58 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
January 27, 2022 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing from the Department of Legislative Services

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: January 26, 2022 9:29 AM - HEARING ADDED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
January 27, 2022 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 26, 2022 12:33 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0056
Del Bagnall

Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
ADDED: 12:05 PM
REMOVED: 12:33 PM
HB0428
Del Rosenberg

Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0445
Del Smith

Property Tax - Constant Yield Tax Rate - Notice Requirements
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0449
Del Smith

Property Tax - Renters' Property Tax Relief Program - Application Period
ADDED: 12:05 PM

Change made: January 26, 2022 11:18 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0315
Del Novotny

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
HB0317
Del Novotny

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
HB0366
Del Lierman

Office of the Comptroller - Legal Division and Private Letter Ruling Procedures
HB0386
Del D. Jones, et al

Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Local State of Emergency
HB0403
Del Korman

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
HB0405
Del Lehman, et al

Income Tax – Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit
HB0432
Del Wells

Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Alterations
HB0457
Del Lehman, et al

Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule and Combined Reporting

Other
No. 9 - Anne Arundel County
Change made: January 26, 2022 11:30 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 9 - Anne Arundel County - Other
January 28, 2022 8:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Bi-weekly meeting of the Anne Arundel County Senate Delegation

Click to return on the top page