Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 9/21/2023 8:55:56 PM
Thursday, September 21, 2023
Thursday, September 21, 2023
Other
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Change made: September 21, 2023 3:35 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
October 17, 2023 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Presentation from the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability on recent reports.

Change made: September 21, 2023 3:36 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
November 14, 2023 10:00 AM
Location-TBD
Office of Legislative Audits; TBD

Change made: September 21, 2023 3:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
December 13, 2023 10:00 AM
Location-TBD
Office of Legislative Audits; TBD

Click to return on the top page